GA HB430 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 20 of the O.C.G.A., relating to education, so as to implement recommendations from the Governor's Education Reform Commission with respect to charter schools; to provide for allotment sheets for charter schools; to provide for the establishment of a code of principles and standards of charter school authorizing; to provide for termination and nonrenewal of charters for charter schools that perform in the bottom quartile on state-wide student performance tests for three consecutive years; to provide for a facilities grant program for charter schools; to define "unused facilities" for purposes of charter schools; to revise provisions relating to funding for state charter schools; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Governor's Education Reform Commission; charter schools; implement recommendations
Sponsors
Rep. Buzz Brockway [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Mike Glanton [D] | Rep. Valencia Stovall [D] |
Rep. Randy Nix [R] | Sen. Francis Millar [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #346 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #417 (Y: 102 N: 56 NV: 13 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #378 (Y: 37 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #297 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #239 (Y: 127 N: 33 NV: 9 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #417 (Y: 102 N: 56 NV: 13 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #378 (Y: 37 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #297 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #239 (Y: 127 N: 33 NV: 9 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-04-27 | Act 33 | |
2017-04-27 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2017-03-30 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-17 | House | House Hopper |