GA HB429 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 24 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance generally, so as to provide that no health benefit plan shall restrict coverage for prescribed treatment based upon the insured's diagnosis with a terminal condition; to provide for definitions; to provide for penalties; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; no health benefit plan shall restrict coverage for prescribed treatment based upon insured's diagnosis with a terminal condition; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-02 - House - House Vote #394 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #269 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #239 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #238 (Y: 105 N: 61 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-01 Effective Date
2015-04-29 Act 31
2015-04-29HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2015-04-09HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2015-04-02HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2015-03-31SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2015-03-31SenateSenate Third Read
2015-03-27SenateSenate Read Second Time
2015-03-27SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2015-03-18SenateSenate Read and Referred
2015-03-13HouseHouse Passed/Adopted As Amended
2015-03-13HouseHouse Third Readers
2015-03-11HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2015-02-24HouseHouse Second Readers
2015-02-23HouseHouse First Readers
2015-02-20HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback