GA HB428 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 42 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to downtown development authorities, so as to authorize assessments under Code Section 36-42-17; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Downtown development authorities; authorize assessments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #353 (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #297 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #189 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #297 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #189 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-09 | Act 264 | |
2017-05-09 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-22 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-17 | House | House Hopper |