GA HB427 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 34 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to physicians for rural areas assistance, so as to expand the service cancelable loan program for physicians in underserved areas to other health care practitioners; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physicians and Health Care Practitioners for Rural Areas Assistance Act; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #275 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Vote #126 (Y: 167 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Effective Date
2017-05-08 Act 176
2017-05-08HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-03-28SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-20SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-20SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-27HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-02-27HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-22HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-21HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-21HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-17HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback