GA HB425 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Veto V5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Veto V5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to elementary and secondary education, so as to provide for administration of standardized assessments in paper-and-pencil format upon parental request; to discourage punitive actions for students refusing to participate in federal, state, or locally mandated standardized assessments; to provide for alternative administrations of student assessments; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Elementary and secondary education; administration of standardized assessments in paper-and-pencil format upon parental request; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Joyce Chandler [R] | Rep. Dave Belton [R] | Rep. Wesley Cantrell [R] | Rep. Clay Cox [R] |
Rep. Mike Glanton [D] | Sen. Francis Millar [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #204 (Y: 44 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #218 (Y: 151 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #218 (Y: 151 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Veto V5 | |
2017-05-09 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-17 | House | House Hopper |