GA HB424 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to income taxes, so as to change certain definitions regarding such taxes; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax; change certain definitions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-30 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #750 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 424, Hb 934, Hb 997, Hb 1034, Hb 1041: Senate Vote #745 (Y: 34 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Passage: House Vote #744 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-09 Effective Date 2022-07-01
2022-05-09 Act 858
2022-05-09HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2022-04-06HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2022-03-30SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2022-03-30SenateSenate Third Read
2022-03-30SenateSenate Engrossed
2022-03-23SenateSenate Read Second Time
2022-03-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2022-03-16SenateSenate Read and Referred
2022-03-15HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2022-03-15HouseHouse Third Readers
2022-03-11HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-17HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-02-16HouseHouse First Readers
2021-02-11HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback