GA HB423 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for a new homestead exemption from City of South Fulton ad valorem taxes for municipal purposes in an amount equal to the amount by which the current year assessed value of a homestead exceeds the adjusted base year assessed value of such homestead; to provide for definitions; to specify the terms and conditions of the exemption and the procedures relating thereto; to provide for related matters; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide for applicability; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

South Fulton, City of; ad valorem tax for municipal purposes; provide new homestead exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #217 (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Vote #80 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07 Effective Date
2019-05-07 Act 293
2019-05-07HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-03-22SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-03-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-27HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-02-27HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-25HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-22HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-21HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback