GA HB423 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 6 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to unfair trade practices, so as to provide that certain acts by residential contractors as they relate to insurance claims shall be considered violations of unfair trade practice; to provide for definitions; to provide for certain contractual requirements; to prohibit rebate or other compensation as inducement for an insured to enter into an agreement; to provide for notice language; to provide for penalties; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Unfair trade practices; certain residential contractors insurance claims; violations; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Rich Golick [R] | Rep. Bill Hembree [R] | Rep. Carolyn Hugley [D] | Rep. Howard Maxwell [R] |
Rep. Quincy Murphy [D] | Rep. Carlton Rogers [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - House - House Vote #364 - Agree Sen Sub (Y: 167 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #343 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House Vote #158 - Passage (Y: 154 N: 1 NV: 19 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #343 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House Vote #158 - Passage (Y: 154 N: 1 NV: 19 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-12 | Act 201 | |
2011-05-12 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-26 | House Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-14 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Taken from Table | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Tabled | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-14 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-14 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-10 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-03 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-03-03 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-02 | House First Readers |