GA HB414 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 6 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Aviation Authority, so as to revise the duties of the Georgia Aviation Authority; to provide for the transfer of certain personnel, aircraft, and other assets from the Georgia Aviation Authority to the Department of Public Safety; to provide for related matters; to amend Chapter 2 of Title 35 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Department of Public Safety, so as to transfer certain personnel, assets, and liabilities of the Georgia Aviation Authority to the Department of Public Safety; to provide the department with certain authority and duties with regard to aviation; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Aviation Authority; revise duties
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Beardon [R] | Sen. Jim Butterworth [R] | Rep. Mike Cheokas [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] |
Rep. John Meadows [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - House - House Vote #348 - Agree Sen Sub (Y: 154 N: 7 NV: 17 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #348 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 47 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - House Vote #119 - Passage (Y: 145 N: 16 NV: 13 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #348 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 47 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - House Vote #119 - Passage (Y: 145 N: 16 NV: 13 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-11 | Act 100 | |
2011-05-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-26 | House Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-14 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Taken from Table | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Tabled | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-08 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-08 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-04 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-02 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-01 | House First Readers |