GA HB413 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-29 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-29 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 33-1-25 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the "Georgia Agribusiness and Rural Jobs Act," so as to provide for a second round of funding and period for applications; to increase an application fee and provide for an annual maintenance fee; to change certain reporting requirements; to revise and provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Agribusiness and Rural Jobs Act; second round of funding and period for applications; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Noel Williams [R] | Rep. Steven Meeks [R] | Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] | Rep. Robert Dickey [R] |
Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] | Rep. James Burchett [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2023-03-02 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-15 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-14 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/64372 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/214594 |