GA HB411 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 32-6-26 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to weight of vehicles and loads, so as to provide for the maximum total gross weight for vehicles hauling unfinished wood products when traveling on noninterstate highways; to provide for no restrictions on the weight for vehicle axles hauling such products so long as certain restrictions are met; to provide for a variance for vehicles hauling such products; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Highways; provide maximum total gross weight for vehicles hauling unfinished wood products when traveling on noninterstate highways; provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Rep. Dominic Lariccia [R] | Rep. James Shaw [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] |
Rep. Charles Williams [R] | Rep. Chad Nimmer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2015-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-19 | House | House Hopper |