GA HB410 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Veto V2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 3 of Title 44 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to regulation of specialized land transactions, so as to provide for limits on certain fees imposed on purchasers of condominiums and lots in a property owners' association; to provide for fees for statements of amounts owing to a property owners' association; to provide for the manner of providing such statements; to provide for expedited fees; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Condominiums; certain fees imposed on purchasers; provide for limits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #857 (Y: 155 N: 3 NV: 20 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #680 (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #596 (Y: 153 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Veto V2
2018-05-08HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-29HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2018-03-23SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-23SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-03-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-15HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-21HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-17HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-16HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback