GA HB410 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the State Court of Cobb County, approved March 26, 1964 (Ga. L. 1964, p. 3211), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 10, 2014 (Ga. L. 2014, p. 4102), so as to change the compensation of the judges of the state court; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cobb County; State Court; change compensation of judges
Sponsors
Rep. Stacey Evans [D] | Rep. John Carson [R] | Rep. Albert Reeves [R] | Rep. David Wilkerson [D] |
Rep. Earl Ehrhart [R] | Rep. Sam Teasley [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #108 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Vote #75 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Vote #75 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-12 | Act 213 | |
2015-05-12 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-02-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-19 | House | House Hopper |