GA HB41 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 15-6-77 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to fees to be charged by superior court clerks, so as to change the fee charged for the preparation of an appellate record and transcript; to amend Code Section 15-21A-6.1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the judicial operations fund fee for superior courts, so as to exempt issuance of certificates of appointment of notaries public from the fee; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Superior court fees; appellate record and transcript; change; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Alex Atwood [R] | Sen. Bill Hamrick [R] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] | Rep. Richard Smith [R] |
Rep. Wendell Willard [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #141 - Passage (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House Vote #37 - Passage (Y: 162 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House Vote #37 - Passage (Y: 162 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Effective Date | |
2011-03-16 | Act 7 | |
2011-03-16 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-03-16 | House Sent to Governor | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-02-16 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-02-16 | House Third Readers | |
2011-02-09 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-01-25 | House Second Readers | |
2011-01-24 | House First Readers |