GA HB409 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-25 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-25 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 47-2-244 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to optional benefits available to appellate court judges, notice of election of benefits, eligibility for benefits, disability benefits, and survivors benefits, so as to decrease the age of eligibility for certain benefits; to provide conditions for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Appellate court judges; age of eligibility for certain benefits; decrease
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Christian Coomer [R] | Rep. Patty Stinson [D] | Rep. Earnest Williams [D] |
Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-17 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-16 | House | House Hopper |