GA HB408 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 13 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to an excise tax on rooms, lodging, and accommodations, so as to clarify the application of certain provisions to certain municipalities; to provide for conditions and limitations; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Excise tax; rooms, lodging and accommodations; clarify application of certain provisions to certain municipalities
Sponsors
Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Brad Raffensperger [R] | Rep. Harry Geisinger [R] | Rep. Joe Wilkinson [R] |
Sen. John Albers [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #783 (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Vote #901 (Y: 121 N: 34 NV: 20 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Vote #193 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Vote #901 (Y: 121 N: 34 NV: 20 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Vote #193 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 396 | |
2016-04-26 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-19 | House | House Hopper |