GA HB404 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 7 of Title 44 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to landlord and tenant, so as to provide for a duty of habitability for certain rental agreements; to provide for an exception to such duty; to provide for an exception to landlord tort liability; to provide for definitions; to provide for notice; to provide for a maximum security deposit amount; to provide for expedited evictions for certain criminal activity; to provide for a short title; to provide for applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Safe at Home Act; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-02 - House - Passage: House Vote #150 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-13SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2024-01-08SenateSenate Recommitted
2024-01-08SenateSenate Taken from Table
2023-03-27SenateSenate Tabled
2023-03-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2023-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2023-03-06SenateSenate Read and Referred
2023-03-02HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2023-03-02HouseHouse Third Readers
2023-03-01HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2023-02-16HouseHouse Second Readers
2023-02-15HouseHouse First Readers
2023-02-14HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback