GA HB402 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 3 of Title 35 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the Georgia Crime Information Center, so as to change provisions relating to disclosure and dissemination of criminal records to private persons and businesses; to change provisions relating to inspection, purging, modifying, or supplementing of criminal records; to provide for a definition; to amend Code Section 5-6-34 of the O.C.G.A., relating to judgments and rulings deemed directly appealable, so as to provide for a cross-reference; to amend Code Section 15-11-83 of the O.C.G.A., relating to when a child may be fingerprinted or photographed and confidentiality of information, so as to correct a cross-reference; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Crime Information Center; criminal records; change provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Kathy Ashe [D] | Rep. Stephanie Benfield [D] | Rep. John Hatfield [R] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] |
Rep. Quincy Murphy [D] | Rep. Jay Neal [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-03-16 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-01 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-28 | House First Readers |