GA HB4 | 2018 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-17 - Act 2EX
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to imposition, rate, computation, and exemptions from income taxes, so as to create a tax credit for certain taxpayers based on certain expenses incurred due to Hurricane Michael; to provide for procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax; tax credit for certain taxpayers based on certain expenses incurred due to Hurricane Michael; create

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-17 - Senate - Senate Vote #8 (Y: 36 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-11-17 - Senate - Senate Vote #9 (Y: 35 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-11-17 - Senate - Senate Vote #11 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-11-15 - House - House Vote #5 (Y: 157 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-17 Act 2EX
2018-11-17HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-11-17HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-11-17SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-11-17SenateSenate Third Read
2018-11-17SenateSenate Engrossed
2018-11-16SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-11-16SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-11-15SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-11-15HouseHouse Immediately Transmitted to Senate
2018-11-15HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-11-15HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-11-15HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2018-11-14HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-11-14HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-11-13HouseHouse First Readers
2018-11-13HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback