GA HB396 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 4 of Chapter 9 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to fraud and related practices, so as to provide that it shall be unlawful for a person with intent to hinder, delay, impair, or defraud a creditor's rights to deed or otherwise transfer title to real property to another person without the knowledge or consent of such other person; to provide for sanctions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and offenses; unlawful for a person with intent to defraud a creditor's rights to deed or otherwise transfer title to real property to another person without the knowledge or consent of such other person; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - House - House Vote #102 (Y: 151 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-01 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-01 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-20 | House | House Hopper |