GA HB381 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 19-6-15, relating to child support guidelines for determining amount of award, continuation of duty of support, and duration of support, so as to revise and correct defined terms and terminology, grammar, and punctuation; to remove alimony as a specific deviation in certain circumstances; to exclude certain adoption assistance benefits from gross income; to clarify provisions relating to willful or voluntary unemployment or underemployment; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Child support; defined terms and terminology, grammar, and punctuation; revise and correct
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #393 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #416 (Y: 154 N: 3 NV: 12 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #193 (Y: 162 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #416 (Y: 154 N: 3 NV: 12 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #193 (Y: 162 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-06 | Act 219 | |
2019-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-20 | House | House Hopper |