GA HB381 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 12-2-6 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to authority of the Department of Natural Resources to arrange for and accept federal aid and cooperation, organize volunteer services, and cooperate with government entities and civic organizations, so as to revise provisions relative to department creation and operation of a nonprofit corporation; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Natural Resources, Department of; department creation and operation of a nonprofit corporation; revise provisions
Sponsors
Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Rep. Christian Coomer [R] | Rep. Chad Nimmer [R] | Rep. Lynn Smith [R] |
Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Penny Houston [R] | Sen. Rick Jeffares [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #316 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House Vote #192 (Y: 163 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House Vote #192 (Y: 163 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2013-04-29 | Act 90 | |
2013-04-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-19 | House | House Hopper |