GA HB381 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-12 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-12 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 2 of Title 26 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to adulteration and misbranding of food, so as to change certain provisions relating to enforcement of the Georgia Food Act by the Commissioner of Agriculture and employment of personnel; to provide for inspections by representatives of county boards of health acting as agents of the Commissioner of Agriculture in certain circumstances; to provide for reports and referrals; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Food; Georgia Food Act enforcement; change certain provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Ellis Black [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Kevin Levitas [D] | Rep. Billy Maddox [R] |
Rep. Tom McCall [R] | Rep. Jay Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-10 - House - House Vote #182 - Pass (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-12 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-10 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-10 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-05 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-12 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-11 | House First Readers |