GA HB378 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to revenue and taxation, so as to require the collection and remittance of excise taxes on rental motor vehicles by marketplace facilitators that are dealers that facilitate the rental or lease of five or more rental motor vehicles; to revise a definition; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue and taxation; collection and remittance of excise taxes on rental motor vehicles by marketplace facilitators that are dealers that facilitate the rental or lease of five or more rental motor vehicles; require
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House Vote #544 (Y: 123 N: 34 NV: 10 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-09 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-09 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-02 | House | House Postponed |
2020-02-28 | House | House Postponed |
2020-02-27 | House | House Postponed |
2020-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-19 | House | House Hopper |