GA HB377 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Board of Commissioners of Fulton County, approved December 3, 1880 (Ga. L. 1880-81, p. 508), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 6, 2013 (Ga. L. 2013, p. 4374), so as to provide for the position of chairperson and to clarify the manner of election of such position; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Fulton County; Board of Commissioners; provide for position of chairperson
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Beskin [R] | Rep. Meagan Hanson [R] | Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] | Rep. Brad Raffensperger [R] |
Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Sheila Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #174 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Vote #92 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 20 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Vote #92 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 20 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-02 | Act 89 | |
2017-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-16 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-15 | House | House Hopper |