GA HB375 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-15 - Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-15 - Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-6-15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to knowingly driving a motor vehicle with a suspended, canceled, or revoked vehicle registration, so as to change provisions relating to a plea of nolo contendre; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; driving with suspended, canceled, or revoked registration; change provisions relating to plea of nolo contendre
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Dustin Hightower [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] |
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Tom Rice [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #214 (Y: 168 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2015-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-18 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-17 | House | House Hopper |