GA HB374 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 5 of Article 10 of Chapter 5 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to an exemption from ad valorem taxation for certain farm equipment held for sale in dealer inventory, so as to provide for additional qualifications; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ad valorem tax; certain farm equipment held for sale in dealer inventory; exempt
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Nix [R] | Rep. James Shaw [R] | Rep. Amy Carter [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] |
Rep. Charles Williams [R] | Rep. Chad Nimmer [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #332 (Y: 51 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Vote #424 (Y: 171 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Vote #187 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Vote #424 (Y: 171 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Vote #187 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-06 | Act 153 | |
2015-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-08 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-18 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-17 | House | House Hopper |