GA HB365 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-8-76.1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to use of safety belts in passenger vehicles, so as to modify the definition of the term "passenger vehicle" to which the safety belt law applies; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Safety belts; definition of the term "passenger vehicle" to which the safety belt law applies; modify
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Joe Wilkinson [R] | Rep. Alex Atwood [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] |
Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Sen. Earl Carter [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-04 - House - House Vote #159 (Y: 156 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-03-04 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-03-04 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-19 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-14 | House | House Hopper |