GA HB364 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 6 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to taxation of intangibles, so as to change certain provisions regarding the real estate transfer tax; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Real estate transfer tax; change certain provisions
Sponsors
Rep. David Knight [R] | Rep. Benjie Harbin [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] |
Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #716 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Vote #856 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Vote #663 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Vote #856 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Vote #663 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 393 | |
2016-04-26 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2015-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-18 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-17 | House | House Hopper |