GA HB361 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing in Fulton County a system for pension and retirement to pay teachers and employees of the Board of Education of Fulton County, approved February 2, 1945 (Ga. L. 1945, p. 528), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 11, 2009 (Ga. L. 2009, p. 4004), an Act approved April 11, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 4982), and an Act approved May 6, 2013 (Ga. L. 2013, p. 4026), so as to provide that contributions made into the pension and retirement plan by employees shall be considered employer contributions for tax purposes; to repeal a certain provision relating to employee contributions paid by the employer; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Fulton County; Board of Education; contributions made into the pension and retirement plan by employees shall be considered employer contributions for tax purposes; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Matt Dollar [R] | Rep. Charles Martin [R] |
Rep. Rich Golick [R] | Rep. Roger Bruce [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #178 (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Vote #92 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 20 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Vote #92 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 20 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-09 | Act 258 | |
2017-05-09 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-15 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-14 | House | House Hopper |