GA HB356 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 14 of Title 10 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, the "Georgia Cemetery and Funeral Services Act of 2000," so as to provide that preneed escrow accounts may be titled in the name of and made payable in favor of an entity registered to provide preneed services upon the death of the purchaser; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Preneed escrow; accounts titled in favor of registered entity; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Chuck Sims [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-03-10 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-28 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-24 | House First Readers |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/33117 |
Text | http://www1.legis.ga.gov/legis/2011_12/versions/hb356_LC_36_1814_a_2.htm |