GA HB355 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 6 of Chapter 3 and Article 3 of Chapter 5 of Title 44 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to property owners' associations and covenants and warranties, respectively, so as to prohibit property owners' associations from creating or enforcing covenants which infringe upon a lot owner's right to use natural gas or to install or use a solar energy device; to provide for definitions; to provide for exceptions; to provide for applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Property owners' associations; creating or enforcing covenants which infringe on a lot owners' right to use natural gas or solar energy device; prohibit
Sponsors
Rep. Kasey Carpenter [R] | Rep. Steve Tarvin [R] | Rep. Dale Washburn [R] | Rep. Joseph Gullett [R] |
Rep. Josh Bonner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2023-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-14 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-13 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/64266 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/214333 |