GA HB355 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 5 of Chapter 6 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Carbon Sequestration Registry, so as to provide for the inclusion of building products in construction on the registry; to provide for definitions; to allow participants in the registry to voluntarily report the utilization of carbon sequestration and embodied carbon results; to provide for an advisory committee; to provide for certified third-party organizations to measure the amount of carbon sequestered from building materials that sequester carbon dioxide; to require the State Forestry Commission to publish a list of certified organizations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Carbon Sequestration Registry; inclusion of building products in construction; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Wiedower [R] | Rep. Todd Jones [R] | Rep. Lynn Smith [R] | Rep. Houston Gaines [R] |
Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Angelika Kausche [D] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #305 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - Passage: House Vote #143 (Y: 169 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - Passage: House Vote #143 (Y: 169 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-07 | Act 257 | |
2021-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-09 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-08 | House | House Hopper |