GA HB340 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5C of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to alternative ad valorem tax on motor vehicles, so as to change the manner of distribution of the proceeds of such tax; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date and for applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Alternative ad valorem tax; motor vehicles; change manner of distribution of proceeds
Sponsors
Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] |
Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Dale Rutledge [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - House - House Vote #429 (Y: 98 N: 59 NV: 12 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House Vote #430 (Y: 151 N: 5 NV: 13 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #386 (Y: 51 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #228 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #228 (Y: 166 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House Vote #430 (Y: 151 N: 5 NV: 13 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #386 (Y: 51 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #228 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #228 (Y: 166 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-08 | Act 197 | |
2017-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2017-03-30 | House | House Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed 45th, 52nd, 21st |
2017-03-30 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed 146th, 16th, 171st |
2017-03-30 | House | House Insisted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Insisted |
2017-03-28 | House | House Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-14 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-10 | House | House Hopper |