GA HB34 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 44 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to speech-language pathologists and audiologists, so as to revise licensing provisions; to enter into an interstate compact known as the "Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact"; to provide the State Board of Examiners for Speech-Language Pathology and Audiology with the power to administer such compact in this state and to conduct national background checks for which applicants for licensure are required to submit fingerprints; to provide for definitions; to provide for conditions; to provide for eligibility; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact Act; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #273 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - Passage: House Vote #99 (Y: 165 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10 Effective Date 2021-07-01
2021-05-10 Act 285
2021-05-10HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2021-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2021-03-25SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2021-03-25SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-11SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-03-10SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2021-02-26SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-02-25HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-02-25HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-02-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-18HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2021-02-17HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2021-01-14HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-01-13HouseHouse First Readers
2021-01-12HouseHouse Hopper
2020-11-25HouseHouse Prefiled

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback