GA HB34 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to health, so as to enact the "Georgia Right to Try Act"; to provide for investigational drugs, biological products, and devices for patients with advanced illnesses; to provide for a short title; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for definitions; to provide for eligibility criteria; to provide for written informed consent; to allow manufacturers to make such drugs available; to provide that health benefit coverage is not mandatory; to prohibit sanctions against a physician's license; to prohibit blocking access; to provide for statutory construction; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Georgia Right to Try Act"; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Dudgeon [R] | Rep. Jason Spencer [R] | Rep. Sam Teasley [R] | Rep. Micah Gravley [R] |
Rep. Scot Turner [R] | Rep. Margaret Kaiser [D] | Sen. Hunter Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #578 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Vote #544 (Y: 173 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Vote #544 (Y: 173 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 422 | |
2016-04-26 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-28 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-16 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-16 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2015-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-01-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-01-26 | House | House First Readers |
2015-01-15 | House | House Hopper |
2015-01-05 | House | House Prefiled |