GA HB34 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-7-29.14 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the income tax credit for clean energy property, so as to include certain commercial geothermal heat pumps with the definition of the term 'clean energy property'; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax credit; clean energy property; include certain commercial geothermal heat pumps
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #284 (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #296 (Y: 26 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #297 (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House Vote #147 (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #296 (Y: 26 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #297 (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House Vote #147 (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Reconsidered |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Notice to Reconsider |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read Lost |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-03-04 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-04 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-01-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-01-15 | House | House First Readers |
2013-01-14 | House | House Hopper |
2013-01-07 | House | House Prefiled |