GA HB338 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-5-36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to veterans' licenses, honorary licenses, and other distinctive drivers' licenses, so as to revise qualifications for issuance of veterans' driver's licenses; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; issuance of veterans' driver's licenses; revise qualifications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #337 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - Passage: House Vote #107 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2021-03-29SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2021-03-29SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-29SenateSenate Taken from Table
2021-03-29SenateSenate Tabled
2021-03-23SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-03-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2021-03-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-02-26HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-02-26HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-02-23HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-10HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-02-09HouseHouse First Readers
2021-02-08HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback