GA HB329 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the City of South Fulton to exercise all redevelopment and other powers under Article IX, Section II, Paragraph VII(b) of the Constitution and Chapter 44 of Title 36 of the O.C.G.A., the "Redevelopment Powers Law," as amended; to provide for related matters; to provide for a referendum; to provide for effective dates; to provide for automatic repeal under certain circumstances; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

South Fulton, City of; Redevelopment Powers Law; provide for a referendum

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #304 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #127 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07 Effective Date
2019-05-07 Act 294
2019-05-07HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-03-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-03-28SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-07SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-05HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-03-05HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-05HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-20HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-19HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-15HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback