GA HB329 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to imposition, rate, and computation of and exemptions from income taxes, so as to modify the rate of tax imposed on the Georgia taxable net income of individuals; to add Georgia income tax paid by an individual to his or her Georgia taxable income to the extent deducted in determining federal taxable income; to provide for a nonrefundable earned income tax credit; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax; rate of tax imposed on the taxable net income of individuals; modify
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] |
Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #809 (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #885 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #268 (Y: 38 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Vote #145 (Y: 126 N: 40 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #885 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #268 (Y: 38 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Vote #145 (Y: 126 N: 40 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-03 | Act 367 | |
2018-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | House | House Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed 52nd, 4th, 40th |
2017-03-30 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed 171st, 115th, 106th |
2017-03-30 | House | House Insisted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Insisted |
2017-03-28 | House | House Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-01 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-01 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-14 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-10 | House | House Hopper |