GA HB321 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 6C of Chapter 8 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the hospital Medicaid financing program, so as to extend the sunset provision; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health; hospital Medicaid financing program; extend sunset provision

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - House - House Vote #339 (Y: 111 N: 40 NV: 22 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Vote #340 (Y: 107 N: 61 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #333 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #275 (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #288 (Y: 41 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Vote #324 (Y: 81 N: 89 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-03-28 - House - House Vote #325 (Y: 92 N: 78 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Vote #326 (Y: 98 N: 70 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Vote #93 (Y: 147 N: 19 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25 Effective Date
2019-04-25 Act 42
2019-04-25HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-03-29SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2019-03-29HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2019-03-29HouseHouse Taken from Table
2019-03-28HouseHouse Tabled
2019-03-28HouseHouse Reconsidered
2019-03-28HouseHouse Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub
2019-03-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-28SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-28SenateSenate Engrossed
2019-03-26SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-02-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-20HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-19HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-15HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-14HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20192020/HB/321
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/181515.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/185944.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/187005.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16623
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17056
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17055
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17054
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17072
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17059
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17146
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17110
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17109

Bill Comments

feedback