GA HB321 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act establishing a charter for the City of Fairburn, approved August 3, 1925 (Ga. L. 1925, p. 1024), as amended, so as to remove the millage caps on ad valorem taxation of real and personal property; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Fairburn, City of; millage caps on ad valorem taxation of real and personal property; remove
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #60 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House Vote #58 (Y: 149 N: 7 NV: 16 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House Vote #58 (Y: 149 N: 7 NV: 16 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Effective Date | |
2013-04-24 | Act 71 | |
2013-04-24 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-02-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-02-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-13 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-12 | House | House Hopper |