GA HB321 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the O.C.G.A., relating to sales and use taxes, so as to provide for a program of tax refunds for companies creating new tourism attractions; to provide for a short title; to provide for definitions; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for conditions of eligibility and approval; to provide for agreements; to provide for procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for powers, duties, and responsibilities of the Governor and the Department of Community Affairs and the governing authorities of counties and municipalities; to provide for powers, duties, and authority of the state revenue commissioner and the Department of Revenue; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Tourism Development Act; enact
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-03-14 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-24 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-23 | House First Readers |