GA HB320 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 7 of Chapter 9 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to motor vehicle sales and transfers, so as to change provisions relating to installation or reinstallation of object in lieu of or other than an air bag; to prohibit activities in connection with air bags; to provide for a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; installation or reinstallation of object in lieu of air bag; change provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] |
Sen. Brian Strickland [R] | Rep. Johnnie Caldwell [R] | Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #207 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #246 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #246 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-09 | Act 254 | |
2017-05-09 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-10 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-09 | House | House Hopper |