GA HB320 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 47-2-318 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to membership in the Employees' Retirement System of Georgia of officers and employees of the Georgia Environmental Facilities Authority, creditable service, and contributions, so as to change the name of the Georgia Environmental Facilities Authority to the Georgia Environmental Finance Authority; to provide for related matters; to provide for a contingent effective date; to provide for automatic repeal under certain circumstances; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Environmental Facilities Authority; change name to Georgia Environmental Finance Authority
Sponsors
Rep. Burke Day [R] | Rep. Michael Harden [R] | Sen. Bill Heath [R] | Rep. Bill Hembree [R] |
Rep. Jimmy Pruett [R] | Rep. Anthony Sellier [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #499 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-02-17 - House - House Vote #51 - Pass (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2009-02-17 - House - House Vote #51 - Pass (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-20 | Act 393 | |
2010-05-20 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-14 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2010-02-10 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-02-10 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-01-28 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-01-11 | Senate Recommitted | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-05 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-18 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-02-17 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-02-17 | House Third Readers | |
2009-02-11 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-10 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-06 | House First Readers |