GA HB32 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-28 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-28 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 35 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to law enforcement officers and agencies, so as to require law enforcement officers to be equipped with body cameras; to provide for definitions; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Law enforcement officers; equipped with body cameras; require
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2015-01-26 | House | House Hopper |
2015-01-02 | House | House Prefiled |