GA HB314 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 7 of Title 52 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to registration, operation, and sale of watercraft, so as to provide for the titling of certain vessels; to provide for procedures with regard to titling such vessels; to provide for legislative intent and findings; to provide a short title; to amend Part 1 of Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding sales and use taxes, so as to provide for a cap on the sales and use tax on the purchase or lease of a vessel; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Uniform Certificate of Title for Vessels Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. Marc Morris [R] | Rep. Timothy Barr [R] |
Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] | Rep. Jimmy Pruett [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #396 (Y: 111 N: 12 NV: 47 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #275 (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #293 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #131 (Y: 154 N: 10 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #275 (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #293 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #131 (Y: 154 N: 10 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 247 | |
2019-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-15 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-14 | House | House Hopper |