GA HB314 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to professions and businesses, so as to combine the State Board of Barbers and State Board of Cosmetology; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Professions and businesses; State Board of Barbers and State Board of Cosmetology; combine
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #241 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Vote #171 (Y: 167 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Vote #171 (Y: 167 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-12 | Act 199 | |
2015-05-12 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-12 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-11 | House | House Hopper |