GA HB306 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Effective Date 2021-04-29
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Effective Date 2021-04-29
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 7 of Chapter 2 of Title 14 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to meetings, so as to provide that a corporation may hold annual shareholders' meetings and special shareholders' meetings by means of remote communication; to provide for requirements for such meetings by remote communication; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Corporations, partnership, and associations; corporations may hold shareholders' meetings by means of remote communication; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Stan Gunter [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Scott Holcomb [D] | Rep. Albert Reeves [R] |
Rep. Martin Momtahan [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Sen. Bo Hatchett [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Agree Sen Sub: House Vote #425 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #375 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - Passage: House Vote #89 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #375 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - Passage: House Vote #89 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Effective Date 2021-04-29 | |
2021-04-29 | Act 37 | |
2021-04-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-02-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-04 | House | House Hopper |