GA HB305 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the Sandersville School Building Authority; to provide for a short title; to confer powers and impose duties on the authority; to provide for the membership and the appointment of members of the authority and their terms of office, qualifications, duties, and powers; to provide for vacancies, organization, meetings, and expenses; to provide for definitions; to provide for the transfer of property; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sandersville School Building Authority Act; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #59 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House Vote #54 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House Vote #54 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-03-06 | Act 7 | |
2015-03-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-03-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-02-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-12 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-11 | House | House Hopper |